U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00734
  • Case Name: Blue Air Training Corporation v. Hadley et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • May 12, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 08, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 06, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • April 21, 2025: [Discovery Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 02, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 19, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2024
  • November 19, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 31, 2024: [Continue]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Set Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.