U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00090
  • Case Name: Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. v. Chabad of New Mexico
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 27, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Set Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.