U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00787
  • Case Name: Dickinson v. U.S. Bank Trust National Association et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.