U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00276
  • Case Name: Gachupin et al v. Albuquerque Public Schools et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 10, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Compel]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 26, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 26, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • March 26, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • March 21, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • March 19, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 19, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 13, 2025: [Seal]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.