U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00618
  • Case Name: Alexander et al v. Lopez et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Attorney Fees]
  • May 07, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 06, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 15, 2025: [Vacate]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Striking]
  • April 10, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2025
  • January 27, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.