U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00524
  • Case Name: R&M Government Services, Inc. v. Kaman Aerospace Corp.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • May 14, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 14, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 09, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 01, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 01, 2025: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 25, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 10, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • October 07, 2024: [Counterclaim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.