U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00423
  • Case Name: Marquez v. Baker-Chavez et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 17, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 15, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • October 07, 2024: [Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.