U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01121
  • Case Name: Leal v. Ohio Security Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 01, 2025: [Status Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 21, 2024: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • October 07, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.