U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00516
  • Case Name: Hester v. Lea County Correctional Facility (GEO Group) Staff et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Affidavit]
  • October 07, 2024: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
  • October 07, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.