U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00757
  • Case Name: Oxford House, Inc. et al v. City of Farmington, New Mexico
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 08, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reset]
  • March 14, 2025: [Reset]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 14, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2025
  • February 12, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.