U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-01075
  • Case Name: Ramirez v. Torres
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Striking]
  • April 21, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 14, 2025: [Letter]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 31, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 31, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 28, 2025: [CJA Appointment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 24, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 24, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 24, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Certificate of Appealability]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.