U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00862
  • Case Name: Woodall v. Western Express, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Court's Jury Instructions]
  • May 15, 2025: [Trial Brief]
  • May 13, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • May 13, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • May 13, 2025: [Witness List]
  • May 13, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [Pretrial Conference - Held]
  • May 08, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 08, 2025: [Objections]
  • May 07, 2025: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 05, 2025: [Objections]
  • May 05, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • May 05, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 21, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 21, 2025: [Exhibit List]
January, 2025
  • January 08, 2025: [Exclude]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.