U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00200
  • Case Name: Franklin v. Wexford Health Sources,Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Martinez Report]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Enforce Settlement]
  • March 17, 2025: [Answer Brief]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Answer Brief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.