U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01005
  • Case Name: Santa Fe Goldworks, Inc. et al v. Turquoise Trails LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • May 13, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • May 09, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • May 07, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 06, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 31, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 26, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2024: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 07, 2024: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.