U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01056
  • Case Name: Romero et al v. Santa Fe County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 11, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.