U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00873
  • Case Name: Dees et al v. FEVID Transport, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 06, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
  • April 03, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Certify Class]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 24, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 24, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Clerks Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.