U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00899
  • Case Name: Valtierra v. Nyamsuren et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 24, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
January, 2025
  • January 28, 2025: [Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.