U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00214
  • Case Name: Dorr v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • May 07, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 06, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.