U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01021
  • Case Name: O. v. Board of Education of Albuquerque Public Schools et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 06, 2025: [Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 21, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: [Status Conference]
November, 2024
  • November 20, 2024: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Set Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.