U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01003
  • Case Name: Gomez v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Status Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 28, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.