U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-01071
  • Case Name: Gonzales v. McCabe
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 23, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 19, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Status Conference]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.