U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01051
  • Case Name: Keenan-Coniglio et al v. Cumbres & Toltec Scenic Operating Commission et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 25, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2025: [Appendix/Supplement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2024
  • October 23, 2024: [Reset]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.