U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01025
  • Case Name: Doe v. Santa Fe Public Schools et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Vacate]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Vacate]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 21, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 21, 2025: [Errata]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 18, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2024
  • October 25, 2024: [Leave to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.