U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00887
  • Case Name: T.H. v. Martinez et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 16, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 06, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • May 02, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Seal]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 28, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 25, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 23, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 22, 2025: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 10, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 10, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Status Conference]
December, 2024
  • December 02, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 28, 2024: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.