U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01109
  • Case Name: Joyner et al v. Ashford Posada LP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Witness List]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • March 10, 2025: [Extend (other)]
October, 2024
  • October 31, 2024: [Extend (other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.