U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00964
  • Case Name: Alboreo et al v. Dubai Express Haul, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • May 09, 2025: [Entry of Default]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extend (other)]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2024
  • December 01, 2024: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
November, 2024
  • November 01, 2024: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.