U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00393
  • Case Name: Lindsey v. Albuquerque Public Schools Board of Education et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 08, 2025: [Dismiss]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 27, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 27, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [Show Cause]
  • March 13, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • March 13, 2025: [Compel]
January, 2025
  • January 15, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2024
  • November 01, 2024: [Extend (other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.