U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01067
  • Case Name: Scott et al v. NP Truckline, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
December, 2024
  • December 17, 2024: [Transcript]
  • December 04, 2024: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2024
  • November 04, 2024: [In Limine]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.