U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00919
  • Case Name: Montgomery v. Patterson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 23, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2024
  • November 07, 2024: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.