U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00614
  • Case Name: Reed v. State of New Mexico et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 11, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 07, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extend (other)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 19, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 19, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 09, 2025: [Transcript]
January, 2025
  • January 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2024
  • November 12, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.