U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00932
  • Case Name: Melero v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • April 15, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Staying Case]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extend (other)]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2024
  • November 14, 2024: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.