U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00725
  • Case Name: HTLF Bank v. Garcia
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 08, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extend (other)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 28, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • March 21, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summons Issued]
February, 2025
  • February 14, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
December, 2024
  • December 24, 2024: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2024
  • November 15, 2024: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.