U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00899
  • Case Name: Lipe v. Albuquerque Public Schools et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 09, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 04, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 26, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • March 11, 2025: [Compel]
January, 2025
  • January 31, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
November, 2024
  • November 20, 2024: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.