U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00240
  • Case Name: Ortiz y Pino v. Toulouse Oliver
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 09, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 25, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 17, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 14, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2024
  • November 22, 2024: [Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.