U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00602
  • Case Name: Santa Fe Goldworks, Inc. et al v. Bella Jewelry, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 15, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 15, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 15, 2025: [Strike]
  • May 15, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 14, 2025: [Seal]
  • May 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 12, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • May 09, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 09, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 30, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 18, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Discovery Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 08, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 08, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 08, 2025: [Protective Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 28, 2025: [Crossclaim]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2024
  • November 26, 2024: [Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.