U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00465
  • Case Name: Samra v. Fandango II, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 09, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 13, 2025: [Witness List]
December, 2024
  • December 04, 2024: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.