U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-01080
  • Case Name: White v. City of Hobbs, New Mexico
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 12, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Status Conference]
December, 2024
  • December 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.