U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00148
  • Case Name: Inman et al v. Board of Education of Albuquerque Public Schools et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 13, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • May 12, 2025: [Extend (other)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Vacate]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Take Deposition]
  • March 21, 2025: [Take Deposition]
December, 2024
  • December 11, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.