U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01286
  • Case Name: Garcia v. State Farm Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Compel]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • March 12, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 12, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2024
  • December 22, 2024: [Jury Demand]
  • December 20, 2024: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.