U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00525
  • Case Name: Gomez et al v. Raichart et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 12, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • May 05, 2025: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 14, 2025: [Strike]
December, 2024
  • December 23, 2024: [Extend (other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.