U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01303
  • Case Name: N.S. et al v. Albuquerque Public Schools et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 16, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • April 07, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2024
  • December 28, 2024: [Order]
  • December 27, 2024: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.