U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00378
  • Case Name: Imming v. De La Vega et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Transcript]
  • May 12, 2025: [Transcript]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Bench Trial - Completed]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • March 21, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extend (other)]
December, 2024
  • December 29, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.