U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01044
  • Case Name: Walters et al v. Mora et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
January, 2025
  • January 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.