U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00828
  • Case Name: Greenwood et al v. Brar et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 15, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • May 09, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 09, 2025: [Compel]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Striking]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
January, 2025
  • January 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.