U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00808
  • Case Name: Huling v. Federal Express Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order to Submit Closing Document]
  • April 21, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 15, 2025: [Vacate]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 01, 2025: [Minute Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Vacate]
  • March 26, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 19, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
January, 2025
  • January 15, 2025: [Reset]
  • January 03, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.