U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00332
  • Case Name: Barker v. GR Investment Group LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 28, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 17, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
January, 2025
  • January 04, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.