U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01103
  • Case Name: Board of the County of Commissioners of the County of Bernalillo v. Centurion Detention Health Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2025: [Discovery Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 25, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 16, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 10, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Status Conference]
January, 2025
  • January 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.