U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01163
  • Case Name: Tomlin v. State of New Mexico et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Appendix/Supplement]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Appendix/Supplement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2025
  • February 11, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
January, 2025
  • January 15, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.