U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01291
  • Case Name: Langworthy v. Alcon
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Appendix/Supplement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 16, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 20, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 17, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 17, 2025: [Alter Judgment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2025
  • January 19, 2025: [Vacate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.