U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00821
  • Case Name: Taylor et al v. Santa Fe Public School District et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 09, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • May 02, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 08, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Appendix/Supplement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 11, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 11, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2025
  • January 20, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.